Case: A-4689
A-4689
05/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
J. M. BOOTH, SR., ELLA BOOTHE, JAKE L. HAMON AND WILLIAM P. CASTLEMAN, LYDIA GRABOW HAINES, ET AL.
WILLIAM J. MCLEAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/22/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
03/23/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/30/1954 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
10/20/1954 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | | |
10/19/1954 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
10/14/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae | | |
05/24/1954 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
05/21/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
05/19/1954 | Response to Petition | Petitioner | | |
05/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Respondent | | |
05/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/22/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/23/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
03/09/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
10/30/1954 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/20/1954 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
10/19/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/14/1954 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | | ||
06/30/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/30/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/30/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
06/30/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/24/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/21/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/19/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
05/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/14/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
05/14/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
J. M. Booth, Sr., Ella Boothe, Jake L. Hamon and William P. Castleman | Petitioner | |
Lydia Grabow Haines, et al. | Petitioner | |
William J. McLean, et al. | Respondent | |
Dillard Baker and Robert C. McGinnis | Amicus Curiae |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information