judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1111-89
PD-1111-89
08/01/1989
PDR Case Type
MEEKS, CHARLES E.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/05/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/01/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJames H. McCullough
MEEKS, CHARLES E.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John Charles Paschall
Court of Appeals Information:
10-88-00163-CR
Aff 6-29-89
10th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Robertson
Honorable ROBERT STEM
13,783