judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-82-00013-CR
04-82-00013-CR
10/29/1980
Other Felony
Peterson, Robert Leonard
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/26/1983Mandate Issued
05/26/1983Mandate Issued
04/22/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
04/06/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/06/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/23/1983Submission
02/23/1983Submission
02/23/1983Submitted
01/27/1982Requests Oral Argument
01/18/1982Brief Filed
01/18/1982Case ready to be set
01/18/1982Case ready to be set
01/14/1982Record Filed
12/21/1981Brief Filed
11/05/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/30/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/16/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/24/1981Record Approved
10/29/1980Notice of Appeal Filed
10/29/1980Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
10/29/1980Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
80-CR-1301
Seven years