judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9893
B-9893
10/31/1980
Application for Writ of Error
ROGER S. BRAUGH AND KATHLEEN M. BRAUGH
CORPUS CHRISTI BANK AND TRUST
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/11/1981Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/17/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
10/31/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/17/1981Response to Motion filed
02/11/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/22/1980Motion to Strike filedOverruled
11/17/1980Response to Petition
10/31/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/31/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roger S. Braugh and Kathleen M. BraughPetitioner
Corpus Christi Bank and TrustRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information