judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9895
B-9895
10/31/1980
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES HOWARD DUKE
BARBARA JILL DUKE, AKA BARBARA JILL KURGER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/05/1981Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/05/1980Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/24/1980Response to PetitionPetitioner
11/13/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
11/10/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
10/31/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/11/1981Response to Motion filed
02/05/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/05/1980Reply to Response
11/24/1980Response to Petition
11/13/1980Response to Petition
11/10/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/31/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/31/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Barbara Jill Duke, aka Barbara Jill KurgerRespondent
James Howard DukePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information