judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DYE (MICHELLE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38330
Short Caption:DYE (MICHELLE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C139035Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-13969
08/16/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/10/97, 7/11/01 and 7/13/01. Court Reporter: Kristine Buttell and Joe D'Amato. Filed in district court on: August 10, 2001. 01-13970
08/17/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/18/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-15794
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 18, 2001. Court reporter or recorder Joe D'Amato shall file the requested transcripts witin 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. The motion for an extension of time is granted. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. 01-16009
09/25/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Joseph D'Amato requesting extension of time to file transcripts in case nos. 36909/38187/38262/38330/38392 - case are not consolidated. 01-16188
09/26/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/11/01 and 7/13/01. Court Reporter: Joseph D'Amato. 01-16197
09/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On September 25, 2001, court reporter Joseph A. D'Amato filed a letter, which this court elects to construe as a motion for an extension of time to file the requested transcripts in these appeals. The motion is granted. Mr. D'Amato shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file the requested transcripts in these appeals or show cause why Mr. D'Amato should not be sanctioned. No further extensions will be granted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Nos. 38187/38262/38330/38392-these cases are not consolidated. 01-16356
10/25/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File a 12 Page Fast Track Statement. 01-17950
10/25/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/10/98. Court Reporter: Kris Moore. 01-17957
11/01/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 25, 2001. The clerk shall file the twelve-page fast track statement and appendix received on October 25, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-18301
11/01/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17951
11/01/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-17952
11/27/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-19809
11/27/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-19810
12/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-21132
01/14/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00514
01/14/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00514