judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANNE B. BUTLER V. U.S. BANK, N.A., ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0055
Short Caption:ANNE B. BUTLER V. U.S. BANK, N.A., ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAR3655-10Filed Date:01/14/2011

Opening Event Date:01/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/23/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/14/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnne B. ButlerNPro SeN
AppelleeU.S. Bank N.A. As Trustee for Bank of America Funding Corporation 2007-03N
Precious Murchinson Gittens YN
AppelleeLps Asset Management Solutions Inc.N
Jennifer Ancona Semko YN
Eric J. Rahn NN
AppelleeJp Morgan N
Precious Murchinson Gittens YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 14, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
02/07/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/29/10) (elp)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (14-pgs/tape 10/29/10 proc.)w/cd
02/23/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/01/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (attachment motion is for continuation of service)
04/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AND aple's opposition to to aplt's motion for extension of time
05/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and appendix, and appellees' motion to dismiss appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 11, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the granting of appellees' motion to dismiss. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellees' motion to dismiss appeal is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (ETW) elp
05/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (aples) for failure to file aplt's brief timely
05/19/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal
06/13/2011 On consideration appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, and appellee's joint motion to dismiss appeal, the opposition thereto, and appellee's renewed joint motion to dismiss appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall result in an order granting appellees' motion to dismiss appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellees' motions are hereby held in abeyance pending further order this court. (ETW) elp
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Brief and Appendix (Appellant)Granted
08/05/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Brief and Appendix (Appellant
08/05/2011FiledBrief of (Appellant)
08/05/2011FiledAppendix to Brief of (Appellant)
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Lps Asset Management Solutions Inc.)
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Morgan, Appellee U.S. Bank N.A.)
09/06/2011FiledAppendix (Appellee Morgan, Appellee U.S. Bank N.A.)
09/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/27/2011FiledLetter From Appellee LPS to advise the court appellee has two subsidiaries which were not previously disclosed: 1. LPS Auction Solutions, LLC and 2. Real EC Technologies, Inc. (Appellee Lps Asset Management Solutions Inc.)
10/17/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/23/2012FiledSubmitted to Chief Judge Washington, Judges Easterly, Pryor
04/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Easterly, Associate Judge and Pryor, Senior Judge)
05/14/2012FiledMandate