judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01336-CR
01-96-01336-CR
11/05/1996
Anders brief filed
Wilson, Michael Waymon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/21/2018Record Sent
11/08/2018Letter received
01/19/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/19/2000Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/19/1999Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/22/1999Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
08/25/1999Case file received by higher Court or agency.
08/24/1999Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
08/03/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
06/04/1999Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals.Grant motion
05/21/1999Motion for Rehearing Due
05/06/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/06/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/05/1999Submitted
05/05/1999Submission
05/05/1999Submitted
08/05/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
03/10/1998Motion filed
03/06/1998Brief Due
01/22/1998Motion to obtain record disposedGrant motion
01/22/1998Order enteredGrant motion
09/02/1997Brief Due
07/31/1997Order enteredOverruled
07/28/1997Motion to obtain record (generally pro se)
06/19/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
06/19/1997Case ready to be set
06/19/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/19/1997Case ready to be set
06/13/1997Waiver
06/04/1997Brief received only-oral argument waived
06/04/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/03/1997Motion to consolidate cases filed
01/18/1997Brief Due
12/19/1996Statement of facts filed
12/03/1996Record due
12/02/1996Transcript filed
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/01/1996Notice of appeal filed
10/04/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/19/2000Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
WILSON, MICHAEL WAYMONCriminal - AppellantJames Kevin Oncken
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Calvin A. Hartmann
WILSON, MICHAEL WAYMONPRO SEMichael W. Wilson, Pro Se
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM T. HARMON
684594
Life TDC