judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-80-07054-CV
08-80-07054-CV
09/29/1980
Contract
McFadden, James D.
Gideon, Wayne, et al.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/1983Mandate Issued
02/22/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
12/08/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/29/1982Application for Writ of Error
10/13/1982Motion - extend time to file a MFR - DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/13/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/06/1982Motion - extend time to file MFR - Filed
09/09/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
09/09/1982Submission
09/09/1982Submitted
09/09/1982Case ready to be set
09/08/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/27/1981Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/12/1981Supplemental Brief Filed
02/23/1981Supplemental Brief Filed
02/18/1981Submitted
01/07/1981Submission
12/03/1980Brief Filed
11/14/1980Brief Filed
11/14/1980Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/14/1980Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/24/1980No description available.
10/15/1980No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
10/15/1980Supplemental Transcript Filed
10/01/1980No description available.
09/29/1980Transcript Filed
09/09/1980Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/05/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
142nd District Court
Midland
A-29368
n/a