judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-96-01322-CV
01-96-01322-CV
11/05/1996
Miscellaneous/other civil
Frommer, Pedro
Frommer, Consuelo Letelier, et al
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/2008Letter to trial court clerk for return of record
09/17/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
09/17/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/26/1999Mandate due to be issued
08/17/1999Motion to withdraw mandate disposed.
08/16/1999Motion was disposedGrant motion
08/16/1999Order enteredGrant motion
08/09/1999Correspondence
07/29/1999Motion to dismiss appeal disposedGrant motion
07/29/1999Motion to dismiss appeal disposedGrant motion
07/23/1999Motion to dismiss
07/23/1999Motion filed
07/19/1999Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
01/26/1999Extension of time to file Petition for Review disposed by Supreme Court.Grant motion
01/25/1999Extention of time to file Petition for Review filed.
01/23/1999Date final opinion release for publication
01/19/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/19/1999Mandate ordered withdrawn
12/09/1998Extension of time to file Petition for Review disposed by Supreme Court.Grant motion
12/02/1998Extention of time to file Petition for Review filed.
10/30/1998Motion for Rehearing Due
10/15/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/15/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/08/1998Submitted
09/08/1998Submission
09/08/1998Submitted
08/21/1998Extension of time to file reply brief disposed.Grant motion
08/13/1998Brief Received
08/13/1998Extension of time to file reply brief filed.
08/13/1998Original proceedings: Reply Brief filed
08/12/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
08/04/1998Submission
06/29/1998Extension of time to file reply brief disposed.Grant motion
06/01/1998Extension of time to file reply brief filed.
06/01/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
05/20/1998Motion to reset submission disposedGrant motion
05/20/1998Motion to reset submission filed
05/20/1998Motion to withdraw and substitute attorney disposedGrant motion
05/18/1998Submission
05/15/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
05/15/1998Motion to substitute counsel
05/07/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/07/1998Case ready to be set
05/07/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/07/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/07/1998Order enteredGrant motion
05/07/1998Case ready to be set
04/21/1998Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
04/21/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/06/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/08/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/08/1997Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
12/08/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/04/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
10/17/1997Filing fee paid in the amount $10.00 of ext on rec
10/17/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
09/08/1997Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
06/19/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/06/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
04/10/1997Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/27/1997Brief Due
03/26/1997Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/25/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
02/25/1997Statement of facts filed
01/20/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/16/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
01/16/1997No description available.
11/21/1996Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
11/12/1996Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/08/1996Filing fee paid
11/08/1996Filing fee paid
11/08/1996Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
11/07/1996Record due
11/05/1996Transcript filed
11/05/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/23/1996Appeal bond filed
08/08/1996Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
07/10/1996Date judgment signed by trial judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FROMMER, CONSUELO LETELIER, ETAppelleeDennis B. Kelly
Shawn Casey
FROMMER, PEDROAppellantPamela E. George
Trial Court Information
246th District Court
Harris
Honorable DONALD GENE RITTER
9440931