judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9812
B-9812
09/30/1980
Application for Writ of Error
W. W.TAYLOR, DBA SOUTHWEST MORTGAGE COMPANY
DEW FRESH EGGS CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1980Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/15/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
09/30/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/20/1980Response to Motion filed
11/17/1980Motion to Strike filedOverruled
11/15/1980Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/15/1980Response to Petition
09/30/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/30/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. W.Taylor, dba Southwest Mortgage CompanyPetitioner
Dew Fresh Eggs CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information