judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARDISON (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38320
Short Caption:HARDISON (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36527
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C76849Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13915
10/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-16889
11/15/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19128
12/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19505
12/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 10, 2001. 01-19505