judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD M. HETZER and AMY G. HETZER v. JIM D. ENGEL, d/b/a HELP U SELL TEAM PROPERTIES

Case Heading (S-09-0098)
Case Number:S-09-0098Case Docketed On:05/15/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Professions and Occupations (Title 33)
Short Title:RONALD M. HETZER and AMY G. HETZER v. JIM D. ENGEL, d/b/a HELP U SELL TEAM PROPERTIES
Full Title:RONALD M. HETZER and AMY G. HETZER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. JIM D. ENGEL, d/b/a HELP U SELL TEAM PROPERTIES, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald M. HetzerRichard Alan Horning
AppellantAmy G. HertzerRichard Alan Horning
AppelleeJim D. EngelGary R. Scott

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Property - Real
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/15/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/15/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/29/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/30/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' brief; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/01/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/10/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gary R. Scott for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/12/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Vacate Oral Argument (Certificate of service reflects 10/09/09 service date, actual service 10/12/09)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2009Event - Phone Call from Counsel for Appellee, agrees case should be vacatedEventPhone CallFinal
10/13/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/12/2009System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant regarding status of case/settlement. Assistant indicated that case has settled and will file a motion to dismiss.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
11/30/2009System - Status check - Phone Call to counsel for Appellants re dismissal, the parties are still waiting for final settlement payment from one of the parties. Will file motion to dismiss when receivedSystemStatus check - otherFinal
12/30/2009System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant regarding settlement. He indicated that he contacted other counsel who will send the final check, and he will file a motion to voluntarily dismiss in the next few days.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
01/21/2010System - Status check - other. Contacted counsel for appellant's office. Last check was received last week, motion will be filed tomorrow.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
01/27/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
01/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Motion to Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/29/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/29/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/04/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/3/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal