judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAUNCHA ASSOCIATES, INC. V. NICOLE T. MILLARD

Case Information: 11-CV-0045
Short Caption:LAUNCHA ASSOCIATES, INC. V. NICOLE T. MILLARDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2996-05Filed Date:01/13/2011

Opening Event Date:01/13/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/26/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLauncha Associates Inc.N
Darryl F. WhiteNN
AppelleeNicole T. Millard N
John P. LynchNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/13/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
02/07/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on January 13, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
02/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
03/04/2011RECORD INDEX
03/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/08/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 14 days
04/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. (JAC) elp
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
05/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion to dismiss this appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b). (ETW) elp
05/04/2011DISMISSED
05/26/2011MANDATE ISSUED