judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-9826
B-9826
10/03/1980
Application for Writ of Error
RUTH TRAMMELL MORTENSEN AND JEAN TRAMMELL BRUNNEMANN
BRIAN VICTOR TRAMMELL, JO ELLEN TRAMMELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/02/1981Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/06/1980Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/20/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
10/17/1980Response to PetitionRespondent
10/17/1980Amended PetitionRespondent
10/03/1980Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/13/1981Response to Motion filed
04/09/1981Response to Motion filed
04/02/1981Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/06/1980Reply to Response
10/20/1980Response to Petition
10/17/1980Response to Petition
10/17/1980Amended Petition
10/13/1980Miscellaneous letter
10/10/1980Conditional application for writ of error filedDismissed
10/03/1980Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/03/1980Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ruth Trammell Mortensen and Jean Trammell BrunnemannPetitioner
Brian Victor TrammellRespondent
Jo Ellen TrammellRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information