judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEVADA LEGAL NEWS VS. NEVADA JOURNAL

Case Information: 38304
Short Caption:NEVADA LEGAL NEWS VS. NEVADA JOURNALCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A434648Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/21/2001 / Aurbach, PhillipSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:03/11/2003 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:03/11/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
08/13/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lionel Sawyer & Collins--check no. 120051.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13711
08/21/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/29/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14627
08/31/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Phillip Aurbach.
10/08/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-16821
10/19/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-17652
11/08/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-18695
12/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Our preliminary review of the documents submitted to this court pursuant to NRAP 3(e), as well as the docketing statement, ha revealed a jurisdictional defect. This court has jurisdiction to consider an appeal only when authorized by a statute or court rule. No statute or rule permits an appeal from an order denying reconsideration; such an order is not appealable. We hereby dismiss the portion of the appeal from the order denying reconsideration. 01-21533
01/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days. The briefing schedule in this appeal is hereby suspended pending further order of this court. 02-01015
02/11/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-02700
03/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Determining Jurisdiction and Reinstating Briefing. We conclude that the notice of appeal was timely filed and that this court has jurisdiction over this appeal. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-04295
05/17/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 05/16/02. 02-08725
05/17/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. 02-08726
06/20/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 06/18/02. 02-10700
06/24/2002Other Other. Received Table of Contents to Respondent's Answering Brief filed on 06/20/02. Attached to inside front cover of original and copies of brief.
07/19/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 12, 2002. 02-12394
08/13/2002BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 08/12/02. 02-13834
08/14/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. Attached to inside back cover of original and two copies of reply brief. 02-13918
01/24/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on March 11, 2003, at 10:30 a.m. (SNP03-MS/ML/NB)
02/24/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
03/11/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevad Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
05/15/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court denying Legal News' motion for a preliminary injunction AFFIRMED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 03-08285
06/10/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-08612
06/10/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/25/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 12, 2003. 03-08612