judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTHONY W. JORDAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0024
Short Caption:ANTHONY W. JORDAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD15613-10Filed Date:01/10/2011

Opening Event Date:01/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/24/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/11/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/22/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnthony W. Jordan Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/25/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/25/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
02/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (132pgs/Tape) 12/10/10 proc.
02/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (18pgs/Tape) 12/13/10 proc. w/CD
02/24/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011RECORD COPIES
03/03/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/11/2011APPENDIX
05/11/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/11/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/11/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (no oppo)
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/16/2011ORD GRANT APLE MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the Clerk shall file the documents contained in appellee's appendix as Attachments A and Attachment B as a supplemental record. (By: ETW)
06/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (see appendix attached to appellee's brief)
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/18/2011FiledLetter From Counsel Requesting Oral Argument (Appellant)
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/16/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion For Leave to file the lodged reply brief
11/16/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
11/22/2011FiledArgued Before Washhington,Thompson,Reid George E. Rickman Esq.,for appellant Travis A.Hill Esq.,for appellee
02/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Thompson, Associate Judge, Reid, Senior Judge)
03/19/2012WithdrawnMandate********RECALLED ON 5/11/12
04/09/2012LodgedMotion to enlarge the time in which to file petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc and the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
04/23/2012FiledMotion to recall mandate and/or petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
05/11/2012FiledOrder Granting Appellant's Motion To Recall Mandate, and the mandate issued on march 19, 2012, is hereby recalled and the appeal reinstated.
05/11/2012FiledGRANT - Order, sua sponte, that appellant's motion for extension of time to file petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc is granted and the petition is hereby filed.
05/11/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
09/04/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
09/12/2012FiledMandate