judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4671
A-4671
05/03/1954
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
J. H. FORD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/04/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/22/1954Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court CostsFiling granted
08/04/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/21/1954Opinion issued
06/02/1954Document received (See Remarks)
06/02/1954Document received (See Remarks)
05/03/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/03/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Employers Insurance AssociationPetitioner
J. H. FordRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information