judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00070-CR
05-82-00070-CR
01/06/1982
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Nash, Kearney Earl
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/29/2018Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
03/09/1984Mandate Issued
09/21/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/11/1983Submitted
03/08/1983Submission
06/21/1982Brief Filed
05/20/1982Brief Filed
04/16/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/19/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/24/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
01/06/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/28/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Ed Kinkeade
F81-10085-IM
20 yrs tdc & $10000 Fine