judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-82-00002-CR
08-82-00002-CR
01/04/1982
Other Felony
Brown, Charles Edwin
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
08/25/1983Mandate Issued
08/19/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
07/15/1983Petition for Discretionary ReviewRefused
05/09/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/02/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
04/20/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/08/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1982Submitted
11/30/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
10/13/1982Submission
07/21/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedOverruled
07/09/1982Brief Filed
07/09/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
06/30/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/18/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/19/1982Brief Filed
04/28/1982Record filed.
01/20/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/04/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/25/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
65th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Edward Marquez
35,112-65
7 Years