judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-82-00004-CV
04-82-00004-CV
01/06/1982
Contract
Hasslocher, G. a/k/a Jim Hasslocher and Hasslocher, Vera
Heger, Frank and Heger, Marilyn
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/11/1984Mandate Issued
10/11/1984Original Exhibits Returned
10/11/1984Mandate Issued
10/10/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
09/19/1984Order EnteredMotion or Writ Denied
06/27/1984Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/18/1984Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/11/1984Writ of Error filed
05/04/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/26/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/11/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/11/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
04/11/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion Granted in Part
04/11/1984Motion for Rehearing Granted
04/11/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
04/11/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Rendered
03/28/1984Response to Motion Filed
03/28/1984Response to Motion Filed
03/22/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/21/1984Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/07/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/07/1984Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/09/1983Submission
03/09/1983Submission
03/09/1983Submitted
03/02/1983Reply brief filed
12/22/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/27/1982Requests Oral Argument
10/15/1982Requests Oral Argument
10/15/1982Brief Filed
10/15/1982Case ready to be set
10/15/1982Case ready to be set
09/16/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/16/1982Motion to Amend DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/16/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/03/1982Motion to Amend Filed
08/25/1982Brief Filed
08/25/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
08/10/1982Mot. EOT t/file Supp. Transcript Filed
07/22/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1982Letter of Agreement Filed
07/13/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
06/25/1982Exhibits Filed
06/25/1982No Description Available.
05/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedFiling is Moot
05/11/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/06/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/26/1982Response to Motion Filed
04/08/1982No Description Available.
02/03/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
01/26/1982Response to Motion Filed
01/19/1982No Description Available.
01/13/1982Response to Motion Filed
01/06/1982No Description Available.
01/06/1982No Description Available.
01/06/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/28/1981Appeal Bond Filed
09/28/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/11/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
150th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James A. Mckay, Jr.
80-CI-2418