judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOEWENSTEIN, INC. VS. SPARKS NUGGET

Case Information: 38303
Short Caption:LOEWENSTEIN, INC. VS. SPARKS NUGGETCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV001725Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/2001 / Cobb, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Robison Belaustegui Sharp & Low--check no. 50777.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13706
08/16/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William G. Cobb. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/22/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-14240
08/28/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14590
08/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. William G. Cobb.
09/28/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-16405
09/28/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-16406
10/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 01-17026
10/10/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.