judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROY S. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0023
Short Caption:ROY S. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-8067-10Filed Date:01/10/2011

Opening Event Date:01/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/08/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoy S. Young, Jr.Y
James W. KleinNY
Leila Thamer NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/24/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
02/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (22 pgs/Pirfo) 11/30/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (250 pgs/Pirfo) 12/1/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (150 pgs/Janifer) 12/6-7/10 proc.
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (9 pgs/tape) 12/17/10 proc. w/cd
03/22/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/29/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/18/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CF-23 and 11-CF-413 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Corylee Carlyle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant Akiem Williams in appeal no. 11-CF-413. F/O that counsel for appellant Akiem Williams shall immediately tak the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (Young) no oppo
05/13/2011 On consideration of appellant Roy S. Young's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant Young's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 8, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the statement regarding transcript of appellant Akiem Williams remains due on or before May 18, 2011. (Castillo)
05/31/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 18, 2011, directing counsel for appellant Akiem Williams to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has ot been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant Williams shall within 15 days from the date of the order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
06/08/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT (WILLIAMS) NO OPPO
06/08/2011RECEIVED- STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPTS
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellant Akiem William's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant Akiem William's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
06/15/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (A. WILLIAMS) (RT ordered/needed)
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10 pgs/tape) 3/4/11 proc. w/cd
07/08/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (SEALED documents)
07/08/2011RECORD COPIES (11-CF-413)
07/08/2011RECORD INDEX (11-CF-413)
07/20/2011FiledBriefing Order for appellant Akiem Williams
07/22/2011FiledRecord Copies (11-CF-23)
07/22/2011FiledRecord Index (11-CF-23)
08/08/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief 90 Days (Roy Young) (Appellant)
08/11/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant Roy S. Young's motion for extension to 11/7/2011.
08/29/2011FiledBrief (Williams) (Appellant)
08/29/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Williams) (Appellant)
10/06/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver (YOUNG) (Appellant)Granted
10/17/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant Roy S. Young's motion to dismiss appeal no. 11-cf-23, and these appeals are hereby severed, brief of appellee due w/in 30 days.
10/17/2011FiledDismissed
11/08/2011FiledMandate