judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00040-CR
05-82-00040-CR
01/06/1982
Burglary of a Habitation
Leonard Earl Brooks
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
10/25/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/18/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
04/07/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/17/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/21/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/24/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/25/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/23/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/30/1982Letter issued by the court
03/24/1982Reporters record filed
03/24/1982Clerks record filed
01/06/1982Docketing statement filed
01/06/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Brooks, Leonard EarlCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 282nd District Court
F81-4453-PQS
25 years TDC