judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00315-CR
08-89-00315-CR
09/11/1989
All Misdemeanors
Reyna, Jesse Corrales
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/08/1990Shuck purged
08/08/1990Mandate Issued
08/08/1990Mandate Issued
05/16/1990Judgment IssuedDismissed
05/16/1990Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/1990Judgment IssuedDismissed
05/16/1990Submission
05/16/1990Submitted
05/01/1990Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/23/1990Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
03/17/1990Case ready to be set
03/17/1990Case ready to be set
02/20/1990Brief Filed
02/20/1990Envelope Filed, showing postmark date
01/31/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/31/1990Order entered
01/17/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
12/27/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/12/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/29/1989Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/1989Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/12/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/12/1989Transcript Filed
10/11/1989Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Motion - Extension time to file bond dispMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/25/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
09/25/1989Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
09/18/1989Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion
09/11/1989Motion - Ext. to File Bond
09/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/08/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Robert V. Garcia Jr.
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Tracey Scown
Trial Court Information
County Court
Ector
M89-53-B
1 yr jail & fine & CC