judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00438-CR
04-89-00438-CR
09/11/1989
Burglary
Barta, John Patrick
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/01/1989Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
11/30/1989Mandate Issued
11/30/1989Mandate Issued
10/23/1989No Description Available.
10/04/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/04/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/31/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/30/1989Case StoredCase stored
11/30/2014RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
89-CR-1110-A
10 years TDC