judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00372-CV
13-89-00372-CV
09/12/1989
Prohibition
Williams, June
Hon. Menton Murray, Jr., Presiding Judge of the 103rd Judicial District
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/21/1990Cite for opinions
11/30/1989Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/1989Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/15/1989Supplemental Citations
10/05/1989Letter sent
10/02/1989Motion for Leave to File Writ of Prohibition
10/02/1989Writ of Prohibition
10/02/1989Reply brief markd
10/02/1989Writ Filed
10/02/1989Reply brief markd
09/27/1989Verification filed
09/27/1989Submitted
09/27/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
09/27/1989Supplemental Citations
09/27/1989Prayer for Relief
09/27/1989Reply Brief Filed
09/27/1989Designation of Attorney
09/27/1989Submission
09/22/1989Response to _____________.
09/22/1989Reply Brief Filed
09/21/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/15/1989Letter sent
09/13/1989Motion for leave to file writ of prohibitionMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/1989Submission
09/13/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/13/1989Order Entered
09/13/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
09/12/1989Motion for Leave to File Writ of Prohibition
09/12/1989Writ of Prohibition
09/12/1989Filing Fee Paid
09/12/1989Writ of Prohibition filed
09/12/1989Brief in support of
09/12/1989Brief in support of motion
09/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/30/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
103rd District Court
Cameron
Honorable Menton Murray