judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-89-00213-CV
09-89-00213-CV
09/12/1989
Contract
Adame Sullivan Enterprises, Inc.
The Woodlands Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/23/1991Mt to Withdraw Exhibits DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/22/1991Motion to Withdraw Exhibits Filed
01/15/1991Letter
02/05/1990Mandate Issued
12/18/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/18/1989Order EnteredDismissed
11/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/23/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/27/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/20/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/12/1989Transcript Filed
09/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The Woodlands CorporationAppelleeDeirdre J. Johnson
Ralph K. Harrison
Adame Sullivan EnterprisesAppellantDerek J. Lisk
Michael J. Mazzone
Trial Court Information
Honorable John C Martin
39,035