judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01098-CV
05-89-01098-CV
09/12/1989
Other Personal Injury
Fisk, Holly A.
John Pass Investments, d/b/a East Vale Apartments
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/01/1997Record RetentionDestroy
10/19/1990Mandate Issued
10/19/1990Mandate Issued
10/09/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
05/29/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
05/29/1990MattConv
05/02/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/12/1990Response to Motion
04/05/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1990Submission
03/22/1990Submitted
03/22/1990Submission
03/22/1990Submitted
02/28/1990MattConv
12/28/1989Brief Filed
12/28/1989Case ready to be set
12/28/1989Case ready to be set
12/20/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/07/1989Brief Filed
12/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/15/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/13/1989Response to Motion
11/02/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/02/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/30/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1989Response to Motion
10/16/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/13/1989MattConv
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
09/12/1989Transcript Filed
09/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/31/1989Appeal Bond Filed
08/01/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mark L. Whittington
87-4804-H