judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00912-CV
01-89-00912-CV
09/12/1989
Injunction
Buttram, Dr. C. & the estate of Mrs. Veasy C. Buttram
Mascio, Dr. & Mrs. V.C., Mr & Mrs Jan Roush, and Ercon Corp.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/08/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/08/1991Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/16/1991Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
04/10/1991Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
02/13/1991Writ filedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/06/1990Case file received by higher Court or agency.
12/05/1990Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
11/26/1990Writ filed
10/25/1990Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/14/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
09/11/1990Extension of time to file mtn. for rehearing disp.Grant motion
09/11/1990Motion for rehearing filed
09/06/1990Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
08/24/1990Extension of time to file motion for rehearing
08/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/09/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/05/1990Motion to extend time to file sup brief dispGrant motion
07/05/1990Supplemental brief filed
06/05/1990Submitted
06/05/1990Submission
06/05/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
02/20/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
02/20/1990Case ready to be set
02/20/1990Case ready to be set
01/25/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/25/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
01/15/1990Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/06/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/02/1989Motion strans disposedGrant motion
11/02/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/02/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/25/1989Motion to supplement record
10/18/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/10/1989Filing fee paid
09/28/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/28/1989Motion to supplement record disposedGrant motion
09/28/1989Statement of facts filed
09/14/1989Filing fee paid
09/14/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/14/1989Motion to supplement record
09/12/1989Transcript filed
09/12/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/08/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeTom Alexander
StateAppelleeLarry Walton
StateAppelleeFloyd W. Freed III
StateAppellantJerry S. Payne
StateAppelleeHon. Karl Maley
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
85-43632