judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRY MILTON WATSON, SR. v. BECKY JEAN POLANSKI

Case Heading (S-09-0087)
Case Number:S-09-0087Case Docketed On:04/30/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:HARRY MILTON WATSON, SR. v. BECKY JEAN POLANSKI
Full Title:HARRY MILTON WATSON, SR., Appellant (Defendant), v. BECKY JEAN POLANSKI, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHarrold Milton Watson Pro Se
AppelleeBecky Jean PolanskiJason Petri

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/30/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Fees dueNotice-OutgoingFees dueFinal
05/15/2009Motion - Other - Motion to pay filing fee in installments.MotionOtherFinal
05/19/2009Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
06/04/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal