judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT B. NELSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CM-0031
Short Caption:ROBERT B. NELSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Misd. Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD15355-10Filed Date:01/11/2011

Opening Event Date:01/11/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/16/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert B. Nelson N
Lisa Hertzer SchertlerNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/27/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (By: JAC)
02/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (160-pgs/zamora 11/10/10 proc.)
02/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (158-ps/tape kamora 11/12/10 proc.)
02/11/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (8-pgs/tape 12/21/10 proc.)w/cd
02/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/22/2011RECORD INDEX
02/24/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt already filed with court)dfe
03/08/2011ORDERED: That appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order tender the $100 docketing fee or file a motion and financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
03/30/2011ORDERED: Sua sponte, that this court's order of March 8, 2011, is hereby vacated to the extent that it directed appellant to tender the $100 docketing fee or file a motion and financial information statement. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix remain due on or before April 18, 2011. (By: ETW)
04/06/2011CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED - for Lisa H. Schertler, counsel for aplt
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL no oppo
04/22/2011ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL and this appeal is hereby dismissed. See Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986). (By: ETW)
04/22/2011DISMISSED
05/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED