judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHULTZ (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38310
Short Caption:SHULTZ (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010421Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-13765
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of counsel the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order, and serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance in this court. fn1[All filing deadlines shall commence to run from the date on which counsel is required to enter an appearance in this court.] 01-17831
11/01/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on October 30, 2001, appointing Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. 01-18285
11/05/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Washoe County Public Defender. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-18481
11/05/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-18482
11/07/2001MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Appointment of Counsel. 01-18600
11/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-19006
02/26/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 1, 2002. 02-03566
03/28/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/27/02. Signed by: John Reese Petty. 02-05513
03/28/2002AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 02-05514
04/29/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/28/02. Signed by: Joseph R. Plater. 02-07524
05/01/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 02-07690
06/19/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On November 7, 2001, appellant submitted a proper person "Motion for Appointment of Counsel." We note that appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person. NRAP 46(b). Nevertheless, we direct the clerk of this court to file the motion submitted on November 7, 2001. No good cause having been shown, we deny appellant's motion to remove and substitute appellant's appointed counsel. 02-10655
06/19/2002MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for appointment of counsel. 01-18600
07/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn9 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02--MS/RR/NB 02-11448
07/31/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-11622
07/31/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 14, 2002. 02-11622