judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL LOGAN V. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Case Information: 10-CV-0961
Short Caption:DANIEL LOGAN V. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB38656-09Filed Date:07/23/2010

Opening Event Date:07/23/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/29/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/04/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaniel Logan YPro SeN
AppelleeOcwen Loan Servicing LLc.N
Sheldon P. SchumanNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER AS DUPLICATIVE of APPEAL NO. 10CV440; OR as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
09/13/2010RECEIVED - aplt's response to show cause
09/24/2010 ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk shall FILE APPELLANT'S LODGED RESPONSE, It is ****MORE*****
09/24/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
09/24/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the AUGUST 18, 2010 SHOW CAUSE ORDER IS HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is F/ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. (BY: ETW) lw
10/04/2010RECEIVED- aplt's motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED FOR 7/21/10) (elp)
10/04/2010RECEIVED - STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (This is unnecessary since party is IFP),
10/19/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
10/21/2010TMC - motion to dismiss 10CV961 - NOA 10CV1555
11/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (12-pgs/tape 7/21/10 proc.)w/cd
12/29/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/29/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (7-pgs/tape 12/6/10 proc.)w/cd
01/06/2011RECORD INDEX
01/06/2011RECORD COPIES
01/14/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL 10CV961 IS GRANTED and APPEAL 10CV961 IS DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... It is ****MORE****
01/14/2011 FURTHER ORDERED, SS, that APPEAL 10CV1555 IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (BRTEFA) (cb)
01/14/2011DISMISSED
02/04/2011MANDATE ISSUED