judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REINKE VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36266
Short Caption:REINKE VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV14494Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/12/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-09905
06/12/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
06/14/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lee T. Hotchkin-check no. 3317.
06/19/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Petition. 00-10484
06/28/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and/or Deny Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-11074
07/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order.] fn2[Real parties in interest filed a motion to dismiss this petition, which petitioners have opposed. The motion is denied as moot in light of this order.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-12039
07/21/2000Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-12678
07/25/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to petitioner Clyde Reinke in response to his letter received on July 21, 2000.
07/26/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-12981
07/31/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d). Returned, with letter, Opposition to Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus.
08/08/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to petitioner Clyde Reinke in response to his letter received on August 7, 2000.
10/03/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-17421
10/19/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-17498
10/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.