judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RALPH E. PLATT v. ALICE A. CREIGHTON and MURRAY C. CREIGHTON

Case Heading (06-62)
Case Number:06-62Case Docketed On:03/20/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:RALPH E. PLATT v. ALICE A. CREIGHTON and MURRAY C. CREIGHTON
Full Title:RALPH E. PLATT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ALICE A. CREIGHTON and MURRAY C. CREIGHTON, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRalph E. PlattWilliam D. Bagley
AppelleeAlice A. CreightonStephen H. Kline
AppelleeMurray C. CreightonStephen H. Kline

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 18
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/20/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/20/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/20/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/04/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/02/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended index from district court clerk.Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/15/2006Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
06/30/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, depositions.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/17/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William D. Bagley for appellant; Stephen H. Kline for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/17/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/31/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affmiring. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/16/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/16/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/22/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Signed for by L. Glode on 02/20/07ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal