judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Trinity Universal Ins.Co, Security Nat'l Ins.Co, Trinity Universal Ins.Co.of Kansas,Inc., Trinity Lloyd's Ins.,Co, Trinity Universal Ins Co as Reinsurer for Southern County Mutual Ins Co. v. Aiken, Lanny and Lanny Aiken Insurance Agency, Inc.

Case: 02-92-00081-CV
02-92-00081-CV
04/13/1992
Contract
Trinity Universal Ins.Co, Security Nat'l Ins.Co, Trinity Universal Ins.Co.of Kansas,Inc., Trinity Lloyd's Ins.,Co, Trinity Universal Ins Co as Reinsurer for Southern County Mutual Ins Co.
Aiken, Lanny and Lanny Aiken Insurance Agency, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
08/25/1992Mandate Issued
07/08/1992Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/08/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Dismissed
06/05/1992Motion for Dismissal Filed
05/27/1992Exhibits Filed
05/18/1992Other Document Received
05/13/1992Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/1992Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/06/1992Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1992Motion Filed
04/14/1992Submission
04/13/1992Exhibits Filed
04/13/1992No Description Available.
04/13/1992No Description Available.
04/13/1992Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/25/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Trinity Lloyds Insurance CoAppellant
Trinity Universal Insurance CoAppellant
Aiken, LannyAppellee
Lanny Aiken Ins Agency, Inc.Appellee
Trinity Lloyd`s Insurance CoAppellant
Security National Insurance CoAppellant
Reinsurer/southern Co MutualAppellant
Trinity Univ Ins Co Of KansasAppellant
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Tom Crum
91138-C