Case: PD-1011-86
PD-1011-86
09/26/1986
PDR Case Type
KELLY, EX PARTE LARRY DESMOND
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/14/1986 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/28/1987 | REHEAR DISP | DENIED | |
01/26/1987 | REHEAR RECEIVED | | |
01/15/1987 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
12/30/1986 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
10/14/1986 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
09/26/1986 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/20/1987 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KELLY, EX PARTE LARRY DESMOND | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Tom Upchurch, Jr. |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Danny Hill |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-85-00086-CR
Aff 7-11-86
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
181st District Court
Potter
Honorable George E. Dowlen
23,096-B