judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADINA DEVONISH V. CAVALIER APARTMENTS

Case Information: 10-DA-0013
Short Caption:ADINA DEVONISH V. CAVALIER APARTMENTSClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC3-9436-09Filed Date:08/11/2010

Opening Event Date:08/11/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAdina Devonish NPro SeN
RespondentCavalier ApartmentsNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/11/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL Denied
08/11/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (6-pgs/tape 12//7/09 proc.)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (30-pgs/tape 2/12/10 proc)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3(9-pgs/tape 5/11/10 proc.)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (88-pgs/tape 6/10/10 proc.)w/cd
10/26/2010TMC - (LODGED) AAA - motion for IFP
11/01/2010 ORDERED that the MOTION FOR IFP IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the AAA, NPT, to August 11, 2010. It is *****MORE*****
11/01/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the AAA IS DENIED as applicant did not demonstrate any error regarding admission or exclusion of any evidence presented at trial... (RZGLNB) (jl)