judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HETLING VS. H-S LAS VEGAS

Case Information: 36284
Short Caption:HETLING VS. H-S LAS VEGASCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33629 , 33961
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A372728Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ShearingCase Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/23/2000 / Kaufman, JerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Shearing. Law firm of Gordon & Silver.
06/14/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lincoln Gustafson & Cercos--check no. 1490.
06/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10129
06/21/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 14, 15, and 16, 2000. To Court Reporter: Janice Liston. 00-10632
06/22/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 on cross-appeal from Gordon & Silver, Ltd.--check no. 14799.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-10666
06/23/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/11/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 00-11838
07/13/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman.
08/16/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-14279
08/16/2000Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 00-14280
08/16/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-14281
08/23/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs. 00-14809
08/23/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.