judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIRHAN (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36283
Short Caption:SIRHAN (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C165160Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/14/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10118
08/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-13419
08/29/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13701
08/29/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-13701