judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-67)
Case Number:06-67Case Docketed On:03/24/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHEVRON U.S.A., INC., Appellant (Petitioner), v. DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChevron U.S.A., Inc.William Mather McKellar
Erin Freeman MacLean
AppelleeDepartment of RevenuePatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Cathleen D. Parker
Martin L. Hardsocg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/24/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/24/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution. Dray, Thomson & Dyekman, P.C. withdrew and Boley & McKellar, P.C. enters appearance.Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
04/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance of Erin M. Freeman of Boley & McKellar, P.C.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance of William M. McKellar of Boley & McKellar, P.C.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/18/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/19/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/19/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/20/2006Brief - Appellee; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppelleeFinal
08/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/14/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/03/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William M. McKellar for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/16/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/13/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/01/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/01/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/04/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 5/2/07 by Laura Tueller.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal