judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALICE J. WALKER, ET AL V. HARRY CHOI, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0980
Short Caption:ALICE J. WALKER, ET AL V. HARRY CHOI, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2648-02Filed Date:08/11/2010

Opening Event Date:08/11/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/07/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlice Walker N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.YY
AppellantMichael D. WalkerN
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.NY
AppellantEdward C. Jackson N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.NY
AppellantPatricia A. Anthony N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.NY
AppellantDenise Thomas N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.NY
AppellantUlitheda E. Grant N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.NY
AppellantAnthony Thomas N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.NY
AppellantDelores E. Grant N
Bernard A. Gray, Sr.NY
AppelleeHarry Choi N
Brian KassNY
AppelleeEmmy Choi N
Brian KassNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/11/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/11/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY the (trial) court's order to transfer subject property pending appeal and waiver of bond
08/12/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY (AMENDED)to stay the court's order pending appeal and waiver of bond
08/12/2010TMC - appellant's motion and amended motion to stay - opposition
08/13/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to aplt's amended emergency motion to stay.
08/13/2010On consideration of appellant's motions to stay the Aug 6, 2010 trial court order and the opposition thereto, it is O that the motions for stay are denied. FO that appellants shall w/in 30 days file with this court the SRT. (FITHNK)
08/17/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (GP) elp
11/18/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 7, 2010, directing appellantsto file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellants and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
11/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appendix to 1/17/11 - *is a holiday changed to 1/18/11 (elp)
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before January 18, 2011. (JAC)
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/18/2011APPENDIX
02/16/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days (unopposed)
02/17/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before March 24, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/24/2011APPELLEES' BRIEF
03/24/2011APPENDIX - Appellees'
03/24/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/04/2011 ON CONSIDERATION of the NOA...and it appearing that this is an appeal from an order enforcing a settlement agreement to sale real property and the that property has subsequently been sold, it is ORDERED that APPELLANTS SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed AS MOOT... (BY: ETW) LW
05/24/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Referred
05/25/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
06/23/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY to aplt's response to show cause order.
06/23/2011RECEIVED - aple's reponse to aplt's show cause response.
06/30/2011 ORDERED that APPELLE'S MOTION TO FILE THE LODGED REPLY IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the reply. It is ***MORE***
06/30/2011APPELLEE'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - TO ROTSC
06/30/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the issue of MOOTNESS IS HEREBY REFERRED TO THE MERITS PANEL ONCE ASSIGNED and the Clerk shall transmit the response and reply to the merits panel. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits panel as soon as the calendar permits. (BRNBKG)
06/30/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular - TMC
07/06/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/06/2011FiledArgued before Chief Washington, Judges Glickman and King
02/14/2012FiledDismissed as Moot (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and King, Senior Judge.)
03/07/2012FiledMandate