Case: WR-77,106-02
WR-77,106-02
04/12/2012
11.07 HC
RICHARDSON, LORENZO JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/22/2012 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |
07/09/2012 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |
07/09/2012 | MISC DOCUMENT RECD | | |
05/02/2012 | ACTION TAKEN | HC denied W/O written order on TC Fndgs-w/o Hear | |
04/26/2012 | SUPP/CLERK RECORD | | |
04/12/2012 | WRIT RECEIVED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/02/2012 | STORED | WRIT STORED |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Richardson, Jr., Lorenzo | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information
137th District Court
Lubbock
2004-405,496-A