Case: 05-17-00552-CV
05-17-00552-CV
05/24/2017
Mandamus
In Re: Chad G. Stanford, Ted L. Glassman, Turbine Asset Holdings, LLC, Turbine Asset Holdings Group, LLC and JSS Holdings Group, LLC
Yes
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/07/2017 | Additional authorities filed | Relator |
| ||||
06/12/2017 | Additional authorities filed | Relator |
| ||||
05/24/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/28/2017 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
08/14/2017 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
08/14/2017 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
08/14/2017 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
08/11/2017 | Motion to stay disposed | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
08/07/2017 | Additional authorities filed |
| |||||
08/02/2017 | Letter filed |
| |||||
06/12/2017 | Additional authorities filed |
| |||||
05/25/2017 | Fee paid |
| |||||
05/24/2017 | Letter filed |
| |||||
05/24/2017 | Motion to stay filed |
| |||||
05/24/2017 | Fee requested |
| |||||
05/24/2017 | Fee requested |
| |||||
05/24/2017 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
05/24/2017 | Motion to stay filed |
| |||||
05/24/2017 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
| |||||
05/24/2017 | Submitted | | |||||
05/24/2017 | Sworn record filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/14/2017 | Case Stored | Case stored |
08/14/2023 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Turbine Asset Holdings, LLC | Relator | James H. Billingsley Ashley Neerhof |
Principal Aviation Group, LLC | Real party in interest | Michael Patrick Lyons Brian P. Lauten Christopher Simmons |
AerReach Aero Space Solutions, LLC, and Robert V. Hogan | Real party in interest | Mark E. Torian Darren Patrick Nicholson |
United Technologies Corporation, and Pratt & Whitney Division | Real party in interest | Eliot Walker Paul J. Skiermont Steven Udick |
Stanford, Chad G. | Relator | Tim Gavin Kelli Michelle Hinson |
Ted L. Glassman, Turbine Asset Holdings, LLC, JSS Holdings Group, LLC | Relator | Jadd F. Masso Kathryne Morris Charles Martin Hosch David N. Kitner Chase J. Potter |
Trial Court Information
298th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Emily G. Tobolowsky
DC-16-07714
Marcey J. Poeckes