judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EDD REPKA, ET AL. v. AMERICAN NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: A-387
A-387
11/29/1944
Application for Writ of Error
EDD REPKA, ET AL.
AMERICAN NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/26/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/14/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/13/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/09/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/14/1945Letter Filed
09/12/1945Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
07/17/1945Letter Filed
04/26/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/14/1945Brief on the Merits
02/03/1945Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs
01/24/1945Document received (See Remarks)
01/13/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
12/09/1944Response to Petition
11/29/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/29/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edd Repka, et al.Petitioner
American National Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information