judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LUCKETT VS. PANOS

Case Information: 36267
Short Caption:LUCKETT VS. PANOSCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35391 , 35494 , 35885
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A412234Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard & Anderson.
06/12/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09909
06/22/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/CY/DA 00-10665
07/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. This appeal was dismissed on June 22, 2000, for lack of jurisdiction. On June 26, 2000, this court received a motion requesting a bond and reversal of the district court's decision. We deny the relief requested as moot in light of the dismissal of this appeal. 00-12243
07/18/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-12360
07/18/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 11, 2000. 00-12360