judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TIMOTHY RAY ADAMS, a/k/a TIMOTHY FREEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-247)
Case Number:06-247Case Docketed On:10/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:TIMOTHY RAY ADAMS, a/k/a TIMOTHY FREEMAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TIMOTHY RAY ADAMS, a/k/a TIMOTHY FREEMAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTimothy Ray AdamsDiane M. Lozano
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/11/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/12/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/25/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/12/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with faxed copy of waiver - original filed 03/13/07MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
03/12/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/12/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal