judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANIL MIGLANI, ET AL V. GROSVENOR URBAN RETAIL, LP

Case Information: 10-CV-0962
Short Caption:ANIL MIGLANI, ET AL V. GROSVENOR URBAN RETAIL, LPClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB27956-09Filed Date:07/27/2010

Opening Event Date:07/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/30/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/21/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/11/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAnil Miglani N
Michael J. LichtensteinNN
John D. Sadler NN
AppellantShivani Miglani N
Michael J. LichtensteinNN
John D. Sadler NN
AppelleeGrosvenor Urban Retail Lp.N
Eric D. MitchellNN
Michael K. Hibey YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 27, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellants shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) neccesary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/26/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 1/13/10 & 4/14/10) (elp)
08/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (87-pgs/tape 1/13/10 prpc.)
08/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (62-pgs/tape 4/14/10 proc.)w/cd attached
08/30/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (plaintiff's ex.lease agreement, agreement and consent to assignment, guaranty of lease, letter f notification of default) yellow envelope
09/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (defendant's exhibit 1 NFPA 921 2008 EDITION) black binder
09/07/2010RECORD INDEX
09/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/19/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 90 days
10/28/2010 On consideration of appellants' motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and appendix shall be filed on or before January 24, 2011. (JAC) elp
01/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 21 days
01/25/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the appendix shall be filed within 21 days from the date of this order. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/15/2011APPENDIX
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to excuse inclusion of parts of appendix. no oppo
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellants' motion, wherein appellants state that certain exhibits have been misplaced but are not needed for the appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to excuse inclusion of misplaced exhibits in appendix is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's brief remains due to be filed with this court on or before March 22, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/21/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
03/21/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/22/2011COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS aplt (*no opp) (elp) Granted
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
04/04/2011 On consideration of the motion of M. Javad Khan, Esquire, to withdraw his appearance and the appearance of Simon M. Osnos, Esquire, as counsel of record for appellants, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that appellant Penang DC. LLC., is a business that must be represented by counsel, and it further appearing that appellee's brief was filed with this court on March 21, 2011, it is ORDERED that the motion of M. Javad Khan, Esquire, is granted and his appearance and the the appearance of Simon M. Osnos, Esquire, are hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for appellants. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant Penang DC, LLC. shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 3 (c)(2). Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellant Penang DC. LLC., being dismissed as a party to this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants Anil Miglani and Shivani Miglani shall advise this court within 15 days from the date of this order as to the identiy of their new counsel, or whether they itend to proceed on appeal pro se. Failure to comply with this order shall result in appellants Anil Miglani and Shivani Miglani being deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. (ETW) elp
05/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 4, 2011, which directed appellants to advise this court as to the identity of their new counsel within 15 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that appellants have failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that Penang D.C., LLC, is hereby dismissed as a party to this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellants Anil Miglani and Shivani Miglani are deemed as proceeding on appeal pro se. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the case caption is amended as shown above. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (ETW) elp
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/07/2011FiledLetter From aplts - Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Appellant Miglani)
10/11/2011FiledSubmitted To Thompson,Reid,Newman
11/04/2011FiledOrder directing aplt's to show cause.
12/20/2011FiledDismissed (ORDER) (Thompson, Associate Judge, and Newman and Reid, Senior Judges.) (ORDERED that the appeal is hereby dismissed for having failed to respond to this court's show cause order. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a).
03/13/2012FiledMandate