Case: 01-13-00084-CR
01-13-00084-CR
01/24/2013
Sexual Performance By A Child
Adelina Margarita Banuelos
The State of Texas
No
9th Court of Appeals
01/24/2013
09-12-00589-CR
1st Court of Appeals
01/23/2013
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/22/2013 | Waiver by the State to file brief | State |
| ||||
03/12/2013 | Anders brief filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/21/2014 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
09/25/2014 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
09/25/2014 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
09/23/2014 | Certification of Compliance that opinion sent to criminal defendant |
| |||||
09/11/2014 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirm TC judgment |
| ||||
09/11/2014 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
09/11/2014 | Motion to consolidate disposed | Dismiss motion | | ||||
09/11/2014 | Judgment Issued |
| |||||
08/18/2014 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||
05/13/2013 | Reply brief due | | |||||
04/22/2013 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
04/22/2013 | Waiver by the State to file brief |
| |||||
04/11/2013 | Anders response due | | |||||
04/11/2013 | State brief due | | |||||
03/22/2013 | Notice filed |
| |||||
03/12/2013 | Motion to consolidate filed |
| |||||
03/12/2013 | Anders brief filed |
| |||||
03/12/2013 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||
03/04/2013 | Response due | | |||||
02/12/2013 | No clerks record filed in civil case |
| |||||
02/08/2013 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
01/31/2013 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
01/24/2013 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||||
01/23/2013 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||||
12/27/2012 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
12/12/2012 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
12/12/2012 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/21/2014 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/21/2039 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Logan Pickett |
Banuelos, Adelina Margarita | Criminal - Appellant | Adelina Margarita Banuelos Stephen Christopher Taylor |
Trial Court Information
253rd District Court
Liberty
Honorable Chap B. Cain
cr29763
Jo Ann Horn - Leger
10 years